Financial history RICHMOND MAYORAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 258977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.75k £9.90k £127.98k £9.92k £14.78k
Total expenditure £1.15k £6.92k £14.61k £23.87k £25.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A