Financial history THE TRUST FOR DEVIZES

Charity Number: 259653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.54k £2.23k £2.48k £2.47k £2.02k
Total expenditure £3.05k £2.02k £2.23k £3.47k £2.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A