Trustees LANGTON MATRAVERS VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 260975

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lindy jane Cameron | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Louise Elizabeth Counsell | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Julie Glassock | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Wright | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hitchcock | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mary Sutton | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daryle Pearson | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Steven James Hutchings | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|||||
KEITH COOMBS | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.