THE PENNYCRESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making to smaller charities with preference to charities in Cheshire and Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 September 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Priscilla Dicketts | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lady Margot Lavinia Huston | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rose Cholmondeley | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|||||
CHARLES GEORGE CHOLMONDELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.04k | £65.63k | £72.10k | £73.90k | £79.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.97k | £54.66k | £103.54k | £45.34k | £103.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JUNE 1970
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL WITHIN THE PERIOD ENDING ON TH EIGHTIETH ANNIVERSARY OF THE DATE HEREOF (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE TRUST PERIOD") IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION AT ANY TIME OR FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED REVOCABLE OR IRREVOCABLE APPOINT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Beldams Gate
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 5RN
- Phone:
- 07941069823
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window