Financial history QUATERNARY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 262124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £131.07k £116.38k £123.35k £131.03k £124.90k
Total expenditure £60.53k £111.84k £66.86k £166.29k £119.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A