Financial history HAROLD CRAXTON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 263063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.06k £43.96k £15.66k £76.80k £70.17k
Total expenditure £27.87k £1.21k £36.19k £4.82k £43.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A