Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION KING'S LYNN BRANCH

Charity number: 263070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.48k £917 £4.68k £2.20k £2.88k
Total expenditure £3.69k £1.24k £2.71k £2.39k £2.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A