Financial history THE PUTNEY SOCIETY

Charity number: 263242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.85k £10.48k £10.64k £11.87k £11.45k
Total expenditure £11.84k £10.94k £14.72k £11.18k £12.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A