Financial history BRITISH YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity number: 263446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.94m £1.85m £1.61m £1.68m £1.30m
Total expenditure £1.81m £1.73m £1.89m £1.77m £1.50m
Income from government contracts £12.77k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.50k £100.22k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.75m £1.44m £1.51m £1.56m £1.18m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £183.02k £80.90k £106.61k £118.89k £105.49k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.11k £1.05k £928 £5.02k £6.84k
Income - Other £0 £324.59k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £268.34k £53.06k £14.10k £14.10k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.60m £1.61m £1.73m £1.52m £1.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £206.48k £119.68k £166.16k £253.75k £165.59k
Expenditure - Governance £30.37k £9.43k £9.38k £13.06k £10.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £4.87k £0 £170 £0