Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF OXFORD CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 263888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.37k £1.56k £1.78k £3.95k £6.15k
Total expenditure £3.34k £3.58k £325 £1.50k £2.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A