Financial history THE FLORENCE AND WALTER JOHN BURCHELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.91k £40.86k £43.72k £43.83k £44.82k
Total expenditure £36.89k £53.72k £58.87k £68.97k £21.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A