Trustees LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF MINEHEAD AND WEST SOMERSET HOSPITAL AND THE COMMUNITY
Charity number: 265189

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandy Chilcott | Chair | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
kay cheesman | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Stacy Michelle Oliver | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Douglas Ross | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerin Long | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Priddy | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Jane Bradley | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Butcher | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lynch | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Currie | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.