THE FRIENDS OF THE FAVERSHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTRES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the work of the Faversham Cottage Hospital and Community Health Centres by means of voluntary services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 08 May 1973: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF FAVERSHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTRES (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF FAVERSHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE FAVERSHAM COTTAGE HOSPITALAND COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Henry Seymour Simmons | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
]O[PMR MICHAEL JOHN MOORE | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.58k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.30k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 November 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/04/1973 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/1995 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2001 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE FAVERSHAM COTTAGE HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY HELATH CENTRES BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICES.
Area of benefit
FAVERSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 PRESTON PARK
FAVERSHAM
ME13 8LH
- Phone:
- 01795537861
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window