Financial history THE ALPHA OMEGA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 265838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £23.48k £43.00k £25.62k £29.69k £19.13k
Total expenditure £23.86k £13.08k £32.42k £52.68k £31.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A