THE MATERIAL WORLD FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's aim is to encourage the exploration of alternative and diverse forms of artistic expression and to support diverse established charities and people with special needs. It continues to seek opportunities to achieve its stated objective.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 January 1974: Standard registration
- THE MATERIAL WORLD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVIA HARRISON | Trustee |
|
||||||
KENNETH ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
||||||
LESLIE JOSEF BOSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DHANI HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA ARIAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £322.32k | £741.58k | £181.56k | £318.75k | £346.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £799.41k | £1.17m | £374.18k | £471.89k | £385.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £574.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £806 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £166.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.10m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £20.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £1.08m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £75.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2024 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 December 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 December 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 December 2020 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ATRICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD DECEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDATION THINKS FIT SUCH PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AS THE FOUNDATION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHIPLEYS
10 ORANGE STREET
LONDON
WC2H 7DQ
- Phone:
- 02073120000
- Email:
- advice@shipleys.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window