Financial history FOLKESTONE ROTARY CLUB SAMARITAN FUND TRUST

Charity Number: 266883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £21.06k £39.47k £27.39k £23.06k £34.95k
Total expenditure £24.55k £59.47k £25.04k £26.77k £23.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A