Riley Cars Archive Heritage Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of vintage Riley motor cars
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Central Bedfordshire
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 31 January 1974: Standard registration
- THE HAVILAND AND MORRIS RILEY MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- THE RILEY CARS HERITAGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Thomas Brain | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Keith Mountain | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Mark Smith | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victor Riley | Trustee | 18 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tim Booth | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Fletcher | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
G L HAVILAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.21k | £28.80k | £26.59k | £13.95k | £30.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.24k | £6.86k | £19.92k | £15.07k | £14.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £20.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 DEC 1973 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUL 2019 as amended on 06 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN THE PURCHASE OF ITEMS, ARTICLES AND WORKS OF ARTISTIC, HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST (WHETHER BY WAY OF DONATION, LOAN OR OTHERWISE) ESPECIALLY VINTAGE OR ANTIQUE MOTOR CARS, THEIR ACCESSORIES AND ITEMS CONNECTED THEREWITH WHICH ARE OF ARTISTIC, HISTORIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST AS AFORESAID FOR EXHIBITION IN MUSEUMS, GALLERIES AND OTHER PLACES TO WHICH THE PUBLIC ARE ADMITTED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHISTLEDOWN
GADDESDEN TURN
GREAT BILLINGTON
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
LU7 9BW
- Phone:
- 01525850380
- Email:
- geoffreyhaviland@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window