Financial history BEACONSFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 267253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.91k £2.05k £8.35k £7.57k £14.01k
Total expenditure £3.65k £3.11k £7.05k £8.39k £18.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A