Financial history THE HUMANE RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 267779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £676.37k £731.66k £1.23m £938.88k £0
Total expenditure £753.11k £607.26k £527.09k £875.73k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £640.84k £582.39k £1.21m £898.52k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £18.73k £0 £9.43k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £16.09k £0 £18.31k £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £19.44k £12.77k £6.12k £30.93k N/A
Income - Other £0 £117.77k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £577.06k £517.94k £1.15m £701.26k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £699.38k £551.70k £473.20k £795.83k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £53.74k £55.56k £53.90k £79.90k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £45.33k £53.02k £50.78k £198.26k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £619.43k £460.62k £384.24k £597.57k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A