Trustees THE TRURO DIOCESAN GUILD OF RINGERS
Charity Number: 268122

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Arthur Day | Trustee | 17 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Robert John Woods | Trustee | 17 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Nigel Dixon | Trustee | 17 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Beckett | Trustee | 17 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Thomas George Rodliffe | Trustee | 17 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Trihey Clements | Trustee | 17 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julian Fredrick Trick | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Pamela Heather Dorrington | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Joan Howell | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Below | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Owen John Borlase | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Graham Smith | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Jane Young | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Mackonochie | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Fraser Young | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Paul Self | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan McClaughry | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN PERRY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.