LANGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation and running of Community Centre in the Village of Langham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 20 September 1974: Standard registration
- LANGHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN CADMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PETER FREEMAN | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Catherine Ann Hine | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raynor Kim Sumner | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Michael Parker | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stuart Rudge | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Harvey Druitt | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Clark | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elaine Parker | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Sallie Louise West | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Bottwood | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH WINTER | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DENISE HOBDAY | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
BOB SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 11 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SCHOFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.75k | £58.33k | £52.15k | £52.15k | £50.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.59k | £50.07k | £44.50k | £60.56k | £47.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.29k | £11.83k | £2.72k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 5TH APRIL 1978 AND 27TH JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LANGHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF LANGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Endsleigh
MILL ROAD
BOXTED
COLCHESTER
CO4 5RW
- Phone:
- 01206616604
- Email:
- langhamccsecretary@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window