MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION GRANT FUND

Charity number: 268282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The MWF was founded in 1917 and works to support the professional development of women in all branches of medicine. MWF has worked on many successful campaigns over the years and continues to fight barriers that face women in medicine as well as contribute to debates and discussions around women's careers and health. MWF has two national meetings a year and local group meetings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,380
Total expenditure: £9,905

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Helena McKeown Trustee 14 April 2022
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
Kethaki Prathivadi Bhayankaram Trustee 14 April 2022
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
Dr Rose Penfold Trustee 14 April 2022
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
Professor Scarlett McNally Trustee 14 April 2022
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
Dr Olamide Dada Trustee 14 April 2022
None on record
Akshara Sharma Trustee 14 April 2022
None on record
Marina Politis Trustee 14 April 2022
None on record
Dr Devina Maru Trustee 29 April 2021
HEALTH PIONEERS
Received: 47 days late
Susan Ward Trustee 10 June 2020
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
Dr Jenny Vaughan Trustee 10 June 2020
None on record
Dr Angharad Ruttley Trustee 30 June 2019
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
Professor Chloe Orkin Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
Dr Jasmine Thomas Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
Rashmi Mathew Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
Geeta Kumar Trustee 17 May 2019
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS
Received: On time
Dr Lulu Lyons Trustee 17 May 2019
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
Dr Nuthana Prathivadi Bhayankaram Trustee 17 May 2019
MEDICAL WOMEN'S FEDERATION
Received: On time
Dr Mary Rose McCullagh Trustee 11 May 2018
None on record
Dr Fizzah Ali Trustee 18 July 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.53k £6.77k £5.71k £5.80k £7.38k
Total expenditure £8.63k £10.99k £8.88k £9.61k £9.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ENTRANCE B
TAVISTOCK HOUSE NORTH
TAVISTOCK SQUARE
LONDON
WC1H 9HX
Phone:
02073877765