SAVE BRITAIN'S HERITAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SAVE Britain's Heritage campaigns for the preservation of historic buildings and the historic environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 July 1975: Standard registration
- SAVE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC GEORGE REYNOLDS | Chair | 17 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Benjamin Charles Edward Derbyshire | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Francine Aurelia Douglas-Home | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
CLARE ELIZABETH O'BRIEN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Guy Oliver | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Dr PAUL SEBASTIAN ZUCKERMAN | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||
SIR SIMON JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
TIMOTHY CANTELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.07k | £272.64k | £280.24k | £260.04k | £390.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.45k | £381.04k | £273.99k | £336.08k | £405.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH JUNE 1975
Charitable objects
A) TO AWAKEN PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF BRITAIN'S ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE. B) TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF THAT HERITAGE AND RELATED MATTERS AND TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE C) TO SAVE FROM NEEDLESS DESTRUCTION OR DISFIGUREMENT BUILDINGS OR GROUPS OF BUILDINGS AND DESIGNED LANDSCAPES OF SPECIAL HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 COWCROSS STREET
LONDON
EC1M 6EJ
- Phone:
- 02072533500
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window