THE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF DEVONSHIRE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to Charities in Devonshire both Masonic and non Masonic
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
4000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 08 May 1975: Standard registration
- PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF DEVONSHIRE BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS BALL | Chair | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MARTIN FRANCIS ELLIOTT | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DR Reuben Christopher Simon Ayres DM, FRCP | Trustee | 24 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
THOMAS BARRETT WHITE | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||
COLIN CHARLES GALE | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID WHEATON | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|||||||
MICHAEL GERVAS WALKER | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.96k | £142.72k | £160.21k | £128.00k | £168.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.52k | £73.61k | £83.45k | £209.39k | £124.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD MARCH 1975 (AMENDED 5 FEBRUARY 2007) AND ORDER DATED 26 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELEIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE FINANCE COMMITTEE OF THE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF DEVONSHIRE OF ANCIENT FREE AND ACCEPTED MASONS OF ENGLAND SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Lower Hill Barton Road
EXETER
EX1 3EH
- Phone:
- 01392367115
- Email:
- elliott909@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window