Trustees THE COUNTRYSIDE EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 269546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Johnson Chair 27 April 2023
None on record
Owen Turgoose Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Stuart William Newey Trustee 14 December 2023
THE ROYAL ALBERT HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Margaret Claire Lee Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Guy Pitt-Hardacre Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Krista Burwood Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Malcolm Wade Trustee 18 January 2018
None on record
Nigel Burt Trustee 26 May 2016
OLIVIA INSPIRES
Received: On time
LORD RALPH MONTAGU OF BEAULIEU Trustee
THE NATIONAL MOTOR MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE BEAULIEU BEAUFORT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MICHAEL SEDGWICK MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time