Financial history CARHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 269610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.08k £17.24k £13.44k £13.01k £12.54k
Total expenditure £20.22k £12.09k £7.42k £11.54k £10.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 N/A £2.67k £500 £500