HADLOW DOWN PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining and promoting the use of the village playing field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 October 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Shafer | Chair | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David John Munday | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Fake | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAMIAN SMYTH | Trustee | 27 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BRUCE HARRISON | Trustee | 28 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR J THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.07k | £19.48k | £18.67k | £5.86k | £8.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.25k | £17.27k | £20.98k | £11.03k | £8.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.80k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 December 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 30 JUNE 1975
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF HE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HADLOW DOWN.
Area of benefit
HADLOW DOWN
Contact information
- Address:
-
AVOCA
HEATHFIELD ROAD
FIVE ASHES
MAYFIELD
TN20 6JJ
- Phone:
- 01825830435
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window