THE SOCIETY FOR THE MANAGEMENT AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE ARTISTS FUND - BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Artists Futures Fund supports artists in need, namely those experiencing economic, societal, or physical or mental health issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 April 1977: Standard registration
- ARTISTS FUTURES FUND (Working name)
- ARTISTS BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Gee | Chair | 28 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Aurelia Maria Kassatly | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wormack | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARLENE JOHNSON | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Duncan Hooson | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW COLLINS | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barney Hare Duke | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.89k | £40.80k | £23.85k | £894.45k | £109.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £179.65k | £164.60k | £88.34k | £48.07k | £136.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £877.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £860.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.07k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 2ND AUGUST 1827, SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 1926 AND 13TH OCTOBER 2004, SCHEME DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 2005 AND BYE-LAWS AS AMENDED 22ND JUNE 1993 AND 11TH APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED ON 23 AUG 2023 as amended on 07 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN NEED OF ARTISTS, THEIR WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND ORPHANS, INCLUDING THOSE WHOSE NEEDS ARISE BY HAVING A PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Artists Futures Fund
PO Box 1033
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 9WR
- Phone:
- 07950111012
- Email:
- info@artistsfuturesfund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window