BARONESS RENDLESHAM RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists for the purpose of relieving cases of need in the village of Mawnan Smith, Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 December 1975: Standard registration
- THE RENDLESHAM CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin BATE | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Libby Reed | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Brooksbank | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RICKARD | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
EMMA BENNEY | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MILLS | Trustee | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John OHLY | Trustee |
|
||||||
REX SADLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOE WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAT TREMAINE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.03k | £4.55k | £4.63k | £5.09k | £6.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22k | £4.50k | £3.80k | £4.13k | £4.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14TH OCTOBER 1981 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 2ND OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
I) THE PURPOSE OF RELIEVING IN CASE OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF MAWNAN WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES. II) IF AND IS SO FAR AS INCOME OF THE CHARITY IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION AS IN (I) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY THE SAME IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF MAWNAN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS. IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO PERSONS OTHERWISE ELIGIBLE THEREFOR WHO ARE RESIDENT IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE THE SAID PARISH BUT IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OUGHT NEVERTHELESS FOR SUFFICIENT REASON TO BE TREATED AS IF RESIDENT THEREIN OR WHO ARE LOCATED FOR THE TIME BEING WITHIN THAT PARISH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caris Lodge
Carwinion Road
Mawnan Smith
Falmouth
TR11 5JD
- Phone:
- 01326250569
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window