Accounts and annual returns HORTON FRIENDS IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 270801
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required