Financial history PAINSWICK MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 271069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.41k £2.66k £33.88k £18.76k £22.60k
Total expenditure £4.58k £2.55k £53.13k £23.09k £20.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A