KINGSWOOD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ENHANCE THE COMMUNITY LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF KINGSWOOD BY PROVIDING COMMUNAL FACILITIES AND PROMOTING COMMUNITY PROJECTS OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 August 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DENNIS HEMMING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Brenda Hennah | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Ball | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Foxwell | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
liz Kingett | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Werrett | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Terry Buckley | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Kelly | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI BENSON | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||
David Rothwell | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Evans | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pat Casken | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY MANSBRIDGE | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan McClung | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Abbott | Trustee | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bavister | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.87k | £33.68k | £32.94k | £28.13k | £23.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.80k | £15.84k | £30.28k | £39.86k | £24.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £20.39k | £2.87k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 26TH APRIL 1976 AND SCHEME OF 27THJULY 1979
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF KINGSWOOD, NEAR WOTTON UNDER EDGE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KINGSWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Post Office
14 The Chipping
Kingswood
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Gloucestershire
GL12 8RT
- Phone:
- 07443531340
- Email:
- bookings@k-v-h.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window