THE ENGLISH CONCERT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain, improve & advance education & the encouragement of the arts, particularly by the presentation of musical, performances & educational activities. The charity arranges concerts & musical performances & provides orchestra services to enable concerts & recordings to take place.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,209,154
Donations and legacies | £160.06k | |
Charitable activities | £892.53k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £252 | |
Other | £156.32k |
Total expenditure:
£1,196,682
Raising funds | £12.25k | |
Charitable activities | £1.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £14,540 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £12.25k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.18m | |
Retained for future use | £12.47k |
People

4 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 September 1976: Standard registration
- THE ENGLISH CONCERT (Working name)
- P E C CONCERTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Peter Kerber | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Virginia Gabbertas MBE | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Vittoria Isabella de Sabata | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Janet Catherine Reeve | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Ian Marinos Graystone Andrews | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Annette Jane Campbell-White | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Dr VIVIENNE ALEXANDRA MONK PHD | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Alan Gemes | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Dr ALAN STUART HARLEY | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
GEORGE BARNETT BURNETT | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
HUGH JAMES TILNEY | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Dr RICHARD JAMES ARTHUR GOLDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
SIMON PATRICK WEIL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
NICOLA ANNE OPPENHEIMER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||||
JOSEPH SMOUHA KC | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £679.09k | £589.34k | £1.03m | £1.64m | £1.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £677.83k | £569.89k | £949.04k | £1.49m | £1.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.54k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.73k | £144.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £202.43k | £481.50k | £372.16k | £363.02k | £160.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £412.82k | £78.65k | £560.50k | £1.10m | £892.53k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £41 | £1 | £81 | £313 | £252 | |
|
Income - Other | £63.80k | £29.19k | £100.44k | £181.65k | £156.32k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £21.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £673.33k | £569.89k | £945.68k | £1.49m | £1.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.50k | £0 | £3.36k | £680 | £12.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.98k | £1.27k | £4.29k | £6.16k | £3.05k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £238.78k | £378.26k | £471.49k | £563.16k | £632.31k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £56.72k | £176.04k | £188.16k | £132.99k | £186.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED 27 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRESENTATION OF MUSICAL PERFORMANCES AND LECTURE-DEMONSTRATIONS OF AN EDUCATIONAL NATURE AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
240 HIGH HOLBORN
LONDON
WC1V 7DN
- Phone:
- 02039622322
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window