Financial history THE ROBINSON HALL (LOLWORTH)

Charity number: 272105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.76k £24.03k £10.12k £3.08k £293
Total expenditure £5.78k £6.84k £11.81k £9.76k £856
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.91k £8.00k N/A N/A