Financial history BRASH LEGACY (ST ANDREW'S KINGSWOOD)

Charity number: 272576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.46k £8.54k £8.87k £9.11k £9.33k
Total expenditure £7.34k £7.53k £17.90k £15.95k £18.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A