THE RADLEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary aim is the creation of a substantial endowment for Radley College in the form of a central fund, the capital as well as the income of which can be used for the support of Radley. Various initiatives are used for fundraising, with major gifts and legacies being sought. The Foundation is presently funding bursaries for those unable to pay Radley's fees, and supporting various projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£3,574,126
Donations and legacies | £2.44m | |
Charitable activities | £627.51k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £509.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,501,525
Raising funds | £653.05k | |
Charitable activities | £1.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£583,414 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £653.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.85m | |
Retained for future use | £1.07m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £653.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.85m | |
Retained for future use | £1.66m |
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 February 1977: Standard registration
- 23 December 2020: Funds received from 1140415 LT. DOUGIE DALZELL MC MEMORIAL TRUST
- THE RADLEY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF RADLEY COLLEGE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Rushton | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Shaw | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Willis | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Minton Beddoes | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Rachel Bell | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON MELLUISH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93m | £2.21m | £3.27m | £2.54m | £3.57m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.69m | £1.90m | £1.96m | £2.63m | £2.50m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.23m | £1.37m | £2.35m | £1.54m | £2.44m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £352.88k | £465.54k | £512.00k | £543.80k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £627.51k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £353.56k | £373.86k | £405.72k | £453.04k | £509.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £21.00k | £40.55k | £120.34k | £18.97k | £795.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.28m | £1.38m | £1.38m | £2.01m | £1.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £407.85k | £524.64k | £585.55k | £613.78k | £653.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.17m | £1.24m | £1.28m | £1.91m | £1.75m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £54.67k | £61.96k | £73.35k | £69.43k | £73.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £11.49m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £9.60m | £11.64m | £0 | £11.01m | £12.60m | |
|
Other assets | £711.24k | £678.93k | £2.00m | £1.86m | £1.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.06k | £1.02k | £930 | £871 | £827 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 12 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER, PROMOTE AND ADVANCE:- (A) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH RADLEY COLLEGE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE (B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (WHETHER OR NOT CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN LIKE MANNER DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Radley College
Radley
Abingdon
OX14 2HR
- Phone:
- 01235543000
- Email:
- bursary@radley.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window