Financial history THE LIMPSFIELD TRUST

Charity number: 273213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £124.35k £47.75k £54.26k £71.02k £67.69k
Total expenditure £53.33k £52.38k £59.02k £83.93k £76.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A