Trustees THE LIMPSFIELD TRUST
Charity number: 273213

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GRAHAM WATTS | Chair | 07 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Gebreselasssie Maressa | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Foreman | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|||||
John Lewis | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Sophie Corlett | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM ANDREW HOGG | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PENFOLD | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
LYNNE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|||||
ALISON MURPHY | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.