Financial history ALL SAINTS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 273390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £258.63k £29.84k £51.73k £90.21k £36.63k
Total expenditure £25.21k £52.15k £52.16k £48.70k £36.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A