Financial history BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR CEMETERIES IN SOUTH ASIA

Charity number: 273422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £34.35k £37.36k £71.86k £38.91k £64.75k
Total expenditure £31.19k £47.64k £55.38k £46.17k £103.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A