Governing document GLOUCESTERSHIRE ENGINEERING TRAINING LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/02/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 APR 2016
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ADEQUATE TRAINING OF PERSONS EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE. B) SUBJECT TO THE FOREGOING OBJECT, TO EXTEND SUCH TRAINING TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.