Trustees GLOUCESTERSHIRE ENGINEERING TRAINING LIMITED
Charity number: 273571

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Claire Burke | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jack Thomas Quinn | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bailey | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Oliver Marley | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Farrington | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Grey | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Neil Biggs | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Henderson | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arren Kinder | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
TRISTRAM JAMES WILLIAM SOUTHGATE | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL BREARLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.