Financial history LIVE MUSIC NOW LIMITED

Charity number: 273596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £953.03k £971.42k £1.39m £1.28m £1.54m
Total expenditure £982.39k £772.75k £1.17m £1.57m £1.61m
Income from government contracts N/A £108.69k N/A £102.87k £142.47k
Income from government grants £50.99k £40.77k £8.50k N/A £26.10k
Income - Donations and legacies £766.98k £883.63k £1.15m £870.36k £1.16m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £185.48k £86.74k £245.88k £411.20k £383.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16 £1 £0 £0 £286
Income - Other £550 £1.05k £0 £71 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £976.28k £772.28k £1.09m £1.50m £1.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.11k £472 £80.15k £71.34k £104.61k
Expenditure - Governance £4.96k £3.60k £4.77k £12.06k £19.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0