BERKHAMSTED ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Development of the appreciation of the Arts in the Berkhamsted district, by the publication of "The Arts for Berkhamsted" Dairy and by the provision of financial asistance to member organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 26 May 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILES NOEL CLARK | Chair |
|
||||||
HUMPHREY THOMAS NORRINGTON | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|||||
BRIAN JOHNSON | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR Astrid Dagmar Biddle | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BILL NEWBERRY | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ULI GREGO | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEN WALLIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER ARTHUR CLAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315 | £5 | £21 | £36 | £74 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | £309 | £2.30k | £2.62k | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 MAY 1977 AMENDED 6TH MAY 1999 AND 11TH MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN THEIR WIDEST SENSE AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
BERKHAMSTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 SHRUBLANDS ROAD
BERKHAMSTED
HP4 3HY
- Phone:
- 01442863263
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window