ROYAL COLLEGE OF SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RCSLT is a professional membership body which promotes for the public benefit the art and science of speech and language therapy, meaning the care for individuals with communication, swallowing, eating and drinking difficulties. It represents its members by the provision of a range of membership services, lobbying and networking activities. It issues professional guidance & undertakes research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£5,790,000
Donations and legacies | £3.00k | |
Charitable activities | £5.07m | |
Other trading activities | £567.00k | |
Investments | £150.00k | |
Other | £3.00k |
Total expenditure:
£6,158,000
Raising funds | £393.00k | |
Charitable activities | £5.77m | |
Other | £0 |
£280,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £184,000 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £393.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.77m |
People

68 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 August 1977: Standard registration
- COLLEGE OF SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPISTS (Working name)
- RCSLT (Working name)
- THE COLLEGE OF SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPISTS (Previous name)
- THE COLLEGE OF SPEECH THERAPISTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Costello | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Sheeran | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sundeep Sidhu | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Haines MBE | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Edwards | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Crampton | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dharinee Hansjee | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Robinson | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eve Baird | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marian Brady | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irma Donaldson | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Johnstone | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Viki Baker | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Downie | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.81m | £4.96m | £5.15m | £5.59m | £5.79m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.56m | £5.02m | £4.80m | £5.93m | £6.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £184.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.00k | £177.00k | £135.00k | £133.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £130.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £663.00k | £492.00k | £588.00k | £672.00k | £567.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.07m | £4.36m | £4.49m | £4.56m | £5.07m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £77.00k | £67.00k | £69.00k | £96.00k | £150.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £37.00k | £0 | £134.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £130.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.95m | £4.51m | £4.41m | £5.54m | £5.77m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £612.00k | £512.00k | £399.00k | £391.00k | £393.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £76.00k | £36.00k | £47.00k | £54.00k | £152.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £34.00k | £39.00k | £44.00k | £10.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.03m | £4.60m | £4.51m | £4.46m | £3.76m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.98m | £3.15m | £3.42m | £3.32m | £3.60m | |
|
Other assets | £1.21m | £1.85m | £2.27m | £1.97m | £1.80m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £487.00k | £575.00k | £546.00k | £521.00k | £646.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 1953 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 JULY 1977, 20 MAY 1994,13 OCTOBER 1995, 7 DECEMBER 2004, 11 OCTOBER 2005, 11 OCTOBER 2007 AND 03 OCTOBER 2008 AND 07 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 2019 as amended on 07 Jul 2021 as amended on 09 Nov 2021 as amended on 26 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ART AND SCIENCE OF SPEECH AND LANGUAGE THERAPY, MEANING THE CARE FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH COMMUNICATION, SWALLOWING, EATING AND DRINKING DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL COLLEGE OF SPEECH LANGUAGE TH
2-3 WHITE HART YARD
LONDON
SE1 1NX
- Phone:
- 02073781200
- Email:
- info@rcslt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window