Financial history ALTAMONT LIMITED

Charity number: 273971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.63k £19.43k £1.11k £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.81k £37.85k £29.91k £21.79k £1.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A