ALTAMONT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distribution of its income to charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 November 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENRY LAST | Trustee |
|
||||||
GINA WIESENFELD | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS S ADLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS H KON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.63k | £19.43k | £1.11k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.81k | £37.85k | £29.91k | £21.79k | £1.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 May 2025 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2024 | 506 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2021 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH MAY 1977
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 GREEN WALK
LONDON
NW4 2AJ
- Phone:
- 02084578760
- Email:
- henry@henrylast.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window