Trustees COLYTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Carp Trustee 01 February 2025
SOUTH PETHERTON INFANTS AND PRE-SCHOOL PTGA
Received: On time
Nicola Jane Tait Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Kathryn Klaentschi Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Kathryn Rachael Elcoate Trustee 12 March 2022
None on record
Caroline Thomas Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Daisy Nell Robertson Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Caroline Pearce Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record
Timothy Harris Trustee 11 October 2016
COLYTON FOUNDATION
Received: On time