Financial history MULBARTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 274041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £65.78k £47.42k £52.41k £67.55k £69.93k
Total expenditure £51.27k £56.67k £70.05k £64.21k £76.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.50k
Income from government grants £25.00k £26.86k N/A £2.60k £3.00k