Accounts and annual returns THE CRANHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 274447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 20 May 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 09 May 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 May 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 05 April 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required